Petrellis, Basilios (CPSO#: 78881)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
St Michael's Hospital Queen Wing
30 Bond Street Room 6050
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5104
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Mar 2003 to 26 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006