Petrera, Massimo Oronzo (CPSO#: 93334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bari, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
725 Parkdale Ave
Office WM 150a
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4295
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MASSIMO ORONZO PETRERA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PETRERA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. PETRERA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PETRERA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PETRERA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PETRERA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PETRERA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018