Petrescu, Dan (CPSO#: 93098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dan Petrescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Petrescu ( CPSO# 93098 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAN PETRESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRESCU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014