Petrie, Alison Cecelia Rosemary Anne (CPSO#: 61344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 470-3035
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. C. R. A. Petrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Petrie ( CPSO# 61344 )

Business Address:
1415 - 1st Avenue West
Suite 2000
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON CECELIA ROSEMARY ANNE PETRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Mar 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1991