Petrie, David Alan (CPSO#: 61040)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017