Petrie, Ian Buchan (CPSO#: 21742)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: I.B. Petrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 1989
Summary:

 In March 1988, Dr. Petrie had been found guilty by the Discipline Committee of professional 
 misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); and in that he 
 failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21).  Dr. Petrie 
 appealed this decision, and Divisional Court, while upholding the Discipline Committee(s verdict 
 of guilt, ordered that the matter be returned to the Committee for re-hearing of submissions as to 
 penalty.  Consequently, a new penalty Hearing was held in March 1989.  At the close of this 
 Hearing the Committee ordered that Dr. Petrie be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register.  It was further ordered that Dr. Petrie(s licence to practice be 
 suspended for a period of two months, but that this suspension would itself be suspended if he 
 agreed to the carrying out of an investigation of his practice of the kind contemplated by s. 64 
 of the Health Disciplines Act.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 22 Mar 1989