Petrini, Mariano (CPSO#: 53949)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Rome, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017