Petrlich, Steve Tomislav (CPSO#: 63989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East End Medical Clinic
Bellwood Plaza
Suite 14B
900 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 5A1
Phone: (519) 451-0720
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. T. Petrlich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Petrlich ( CPSO# 63989 )

Business Address:
900 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 5A1
Phone Number: (519) 451-0720

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVE TOMISLAV PETRLICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRLICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1991 to 14 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992