Petropoulos, Anna Evangelos (CPSO#: 74128)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 08 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 09 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2001