Petrov, Nicole Mira (CPSO#: 71077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone: (519) 824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: (519) 836-7431
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Easterbrook Petrov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Petrov ( CPSO# 71077 )
Dr. M. Easterbrook ( CPSO# 73752 )

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W2
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
753 Tower Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone Number: (519) 843-4380

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 824-4120

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE MIRA PETROV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETROV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1999