Petrovic, Vera (CPSO#: 77127)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2001 to 12 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2002 to 12 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2003 to 12 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2004 to 12 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2005 to 12 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2006 to 28 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017