Petrovici, Radu Laurentiu (CPSO#: 78612)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Robert Burns Nuclear Cardiology Lab
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 5019
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004