Petrut, Bianca Simona (CPSO#: 82875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Victor Babes University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
5th Floor - 5SE
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Seniors'Health Centre
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Canada
Phone: 416 756 6050 Ext. 8060
Fax: 416 756 3144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bianca Petrut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Petrut ( CPSO# 82875 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIANCA SIMONA PETRUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009