Petter, Tanya (CPSO#: 68882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
233 Major Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2L5
Phone: (416)436-6195
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tanya Petter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Petter ( CPSO# 68882 )

Business Address:
233 Major Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2L5
Phone Number: (416) 964-8340

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA PETTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2000