Pettis, Craig Alan (CPSO#: 27679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
957 Mayfair Cr
Kingston ON  K7M 5S5
Phone: 613-634-0741
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.A. Pettis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pettis ( CPSO# 27679 )

Business Address:
957 Mayfair Crescent
Kingston ON  K7M 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 634-0741

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Active patients can request medical records from Dr. Denise Pitre by calling (613) 634-1078. Inactive patients can request medical records from Docudavit by calling 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 22 Feb 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG ALAN PETTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETTIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1975