Pettle, Alvin (CPSO#: 22872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Aug 1995

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
3910 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 3N8
Phone: (416) 633-4101
Fax: (416) 633-9254
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 11 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Jan 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 20 Jan 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 4, 2006, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Alvin Pettle, in
            accordance with an undertaking provided by Dr. Pettle to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  I have voluntarily relinquished my prescribing privileges with respect to
                  Narcotic drugs and Narcotic preparations as set out in Schedules I
                  through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c.19,
                  and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
                  Drugs/Substances                           Relinquished
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs                                   yes
                  Narcotic Preparations                                  yes
                  Controlled Drugs                                 no
                  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances        no