Petyk Derzko, Christine Mary (CPSO#: 21449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 866-7400
Fax: (416) 866-7401
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division Medical Endocrinology
St Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street East
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 8183
Fax: (416) 867-3679
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Petyk Derzko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Petyk Derzko ( CPSO# 21449 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Endcrinology/Osteoporosis Clinic
61 Queen Street East
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3679

Business Address:
408 - 55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 866-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 May 2006

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 May 2006 Active View Details [+]
            Effective May 3, 2006, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Christine Mary Petyk
            Derzko, in accordance with an undertaking given by Dr. Petyk Derzko to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Petyk Derzko is practising pursuant to a voluntary undertaking which
                  restricts her practice to an office setting and surgical assist only.