Pexman, James Hayes Warwick (CPSO#: 30566)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000