Pexman-Fieth, Virginia Claire (CPSO#: 56856)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: Pexman, Virginia Claire (used until: 03 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009