Peysakhovich, Yury Vladimirovich (CPSO#: 97515)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Novosibirsk Medical Academy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 05 Jul 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 06 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014