Peysar, Gerhard Wilhelm (CPSO#: 80676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GW Peysar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Peysar ( CPSO# 80676 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-0022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERHARD WILHELM PEYSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEYSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2007