Pezo, Rossanna Cecilia (CPSO#: 91562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4757
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSSANNA CECILIA PEZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEZO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2013