Pfaff, James Robert (CPSO#: 28585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Transport Canada
300-4900 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 6A5
Phone: (416) 952-0563
Fax: (416) 952-0569
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ROBERT PFAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PFAFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1987