Pfeifer, Sabine Ingrid (CPSO#: 77475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 16
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 745-7482
Fax: (519) 745-1881
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABINE INGRID PFEIFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PFEIFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2004