Pg Mohd Juanda, Ak Muhd Nadzir (CPSO#: 96714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2011

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 30 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
Division of Cardiac Surgery
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4313
Fax: (613) 761-5107
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AK MUHD NADZIR PG MOHD JUANDA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PG MOHD JUANDA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. PG MOHD JUANDA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PG MOHD JUANDA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PG MOHD JUANDA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PG MOHD JUANDA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PG MOHD JUANDA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018