Phala, Everard Motimpane (CPSO#: 51334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Box 1018
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 358-0171 Ext. 53386
Fax: (905) 358-4967
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Ave.
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Niagara Health System
Welland County G H Site
63 - 3rd Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 732-6111 Ext. 3375
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Everard Motimpane Phala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Phala ( CPSO# 51334 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Box 1018
Operating Room
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVERARD MOTIMPANE PHALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHALA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1986