Pham, Cuong Duc (CPSO#: 69868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2001 Avenue Victoria, suite 101
St-Lambert QC  J4S 1H1
Phone: (450) 465-9927
Fax: (450) 465-1781
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8250 boulevard Decarie, suite 100
Montreal QC  H4P 2P5
Canada
Phone: (514) 731-7717
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CUONG DUC PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 26 Aug 1996 to 22 Sep 1996
Elective Trainee - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1997