Pham, Hoa Cong (CPSO#: 69900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone: (905) 430-4055
Fax: (905) 430-4480
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sophia S.F. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 69906 )
Dr. H. Pham ( CPSO# 69900 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M3-200
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOA CONG PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004