Pham, Nguyen Hoai Huong (CPSO#: 101440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2017

Expiry Date:  07 Nov 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Nguyen  Hoai  Huong Pham may practise internal medicine at Lakeridge
                  Health Oshawa in Oshawa,  Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by
                  a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  three years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Pham's eligibility to take  the  Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Pham's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required reports to the College  by  the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Phams's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 8, 2017,  and  will  expire  on or
                  before November 7, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.