Pham, Thuy-Nga (CPSO#: 79454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thuy-Nga Pham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pham ( CPSO# 79454 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
105 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 469-6464

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THUY-NGA PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005