Pham-Huy, Anne (CPSO#: 79156)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Infectious Diseases
401 Smyth Road, Room 3031
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2651
Fax: (613) 738-4832
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE PHAM-HUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM-HUY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2007 to 16 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2008 to 23 Nov 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008