Phan, Nicolas (CPSO#: 70058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Phan Cong, Nicolas (used until: 29 Jun 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cabell Huntington Hospital
Huntington WV  25701
United States
Phone: 304-526-2000
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 28 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLAS PHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 May 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006