Phang, Sen Han (CPSO#: 100109)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2016