Phatihattakorn, Chayawat (CPSO#: 87429)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Chiang Mai University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008