Phelps, James Howard (CPSO#: 60171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
c/o Department of
Emergency Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-1401
Fax: (519) 837-0133
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Phelps Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Phelps ( CPSO# 60171 )
Dr. H. Noble ( CPSO# 58997 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
c/o Department of
Emergency Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES HOWARD PHELPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHELPS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988