Philbrook, Paul Stephen (CPSO#: 50020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: Philbrokk, Paul Stephen (used until: 06 Sep 1984 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 1P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Streetsville Community Care
1742 Bristol Road
Mississauga ON  L3R 0E8
Canada
Phone: (905) 826-3045
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul S. Philbrook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Philbrook ( CPSO# 50020 )

Business Address:
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL STEPHEN PHILBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILBROOK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1983