Philips, Nabil Antoun (CPSO#: 58838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 413
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 607-1262
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Philips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Dr. N. Philips ( CPSO# 58838 )

Business Address:
Suite 413
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 607-1262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. NABIL ANTOUN PHILIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILIPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1989