Philips, Paris John (CPSO#: 19928)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:National and Capodistrias Univ of Athens, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For copies of medical records for Dr. Philips, please call 905.886.4497
Date Received: 06 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013