Phillips, Anne Michelle (CPSO#: 52277)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: Sheppard, Anne Michelle (used until: 31 Jul 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 12 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011