Phillips, Cameron (CPSO#: 100342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
Room T2 036 - Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4244
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMERON PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2017