Phillips, Elizabeth Jane (CPSO#: 61284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006