Phillips, Joel Timothy (CPSO#: 92972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CBI Health Center
1051 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 3X4
Phone: (519) 680-0031
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL TIMOTHY PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2015