Phillips, Kelly-Anne (CPSO#: 70827)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Monash University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 1999