Phillips, Kent Mckenzie (CPSO#: 22348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Archdekin Medical Group
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C1
Phone: (705) 645-2223
Fax: (705) 645-5286
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kent Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Phillips ( CPSO# 22348 )

Business Address:
Archdekin Medical Group
205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2C1
Phone Number: (705) 645-2223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENT MCKENZIE PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1969