Phillips, Perry (CPSO#: 29758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Montpellier, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-803-8022
Fax: (416) 322-1160
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. Tel: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 13 Mar 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERRY PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1978