Phillips, Samuel Patrick (CPSO#: 58511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
17030 Lakeside Hills Plaza
Omaha NE  68130
United States
Phone: (402) 399-8550
Fax: (402) 399-8455

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Iowa
USA - Nebraska

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL PATRICK PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1992 to 30 Nov 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2009