Phillipson, Wayne George (CPSO#: 61090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 302
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 495-6232
Fax: (705) 495-6921
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wayne Phillipson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Phillipson ( CPSO# 61090 )

Business Address:
302 - 1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone Number: (705) 495-6232

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE GEORGE PHILLIPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1990