Philp, Lauren Anne Catherine (CPSO#: 97722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: Philp, Lauren A (used until: 10 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
123 Edward Street Suite 1200
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-978-2668
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN ANNE CATHERINE PHILP shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PHILP is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. PHILP shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PHILP is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PHILP shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PHILP is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PHILP no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018