Philp, Lorraine Barbrea (CPSO#: 62684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: Philp White, Lorraine Barbrea (used until: 04 Jul 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 700
1240 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A7
Phone: (416) 977-5427
Fax: (416) 646-0205
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRAINE BARBREA PHILP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1991