Photopoulos, George (CPSO#: 62656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 May 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208 Bloor Street West
Suite 405
Toronto ON  M5S 3B4
Phone: (416) 962-1200
Fax: (416) 962-1223
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 May 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 May 2009 Active View Details [+]

            As from May 27, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George Photopoulos,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Photopoulos to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                  I, Dr. George Photopoulos, have voluntarily relinquished my prescribing
                  privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and
                  preparations set out in Schedules I through IV of the Controlled Drugs
                  and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c. 19, as amended, and related regulations
                  (the "Act"), and summarized as follows
                  
                  Drug/Substance          Relinquished       Not Relinquished
                  
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs                x                                    
                  Narcotic Preparations         x                  
                  Controlled Drugs              x                        
                  Benzodiazepines/Other         x
                  Targeted Substances